+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On August 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.248
On August 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.949
- Substituted For S8019a
On June 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly
- Delivered To Senate
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.118
- Rules Report Cal.118
On June 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On June 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On June 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 10327a
- Amend And Recommit To Local Governments
On April 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments
+ − Vote
June 18, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor