+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On July 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.159
On July 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1014
- Substituted For S8059
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
On May 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.964
On May 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On May 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On April 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
+ − Vote
June 4, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor