+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On December 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Approval Memo.53
- Signed Chap.735
On December 12, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1724
- Substituted For S9367
On May 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On May 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.286
- Rules Report Cal.286
- Reported
On May 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Insurance
On January 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Insurance
+ − Vote
June 1, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor