+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On December 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Approval Memo.66
- Signed Chap.759
On December 12, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1594
- Substituted For S9140
On May 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
On May 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.381
- Rules Report Cal.381
- Reported
On May 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 9, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On May 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
+ − Vote
June 1, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor