+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On June 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.301
On June 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On May 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1479
- Substituted For S9338
- Referred To Rules
On May 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.380
- Rules Report Cal.380
- Reported
On May 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Labor
+ − Vote
May 24, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor