+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On June 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.295
On June 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On May 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1173
- Substituted For S8980
On May 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Social Services
On May 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.267
- Rules Report Cal.267
- Reported
On May 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 4, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Social Services
+ − Vote
May 24, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 2