+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S7772a
On June 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.366
- Rules Report Cal.366
- Reported
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 10146a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Ways And Means
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor