+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S7770b
On June 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.304
- Rules Report Cal.304
- Reported
On June 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 10143b
- Amend And Recommit To Ways And Means
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 10143a
- Amend And Recommit To Local Governments
On May 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor