+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
On March 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On March 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.91
On March 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On February 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On January 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions