+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S6701b
On June 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.410
- Rules Report Cal.410
- Reported
On June 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 10101a
- Amend And Recommit To Labor
On May 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Labor
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor