+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On August 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.245
On August 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.810
- Substituted For S6138
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
On March 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On March 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.726
On March 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On March 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Judiciary
+ − Vote
June 12, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor