+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On September 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.308
On August 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1872
- Substituted For S7602
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
On June 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Home Rule Request
On May 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.862
On May 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On May 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Cities
+ − Vote
June 16, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor