+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On July 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.138
On July 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1663
- Substituted For S7905
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
On June 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.857
On May 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On May 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Economic Development
+ − Vote
June 9, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor