+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S7429
On June 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.301
- Rules Report Cal.301
- Reported
On June 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor