+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to codes
On May 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Print number 1003b
- Amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to consumer affairs and protection
On June 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to rules
On June 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to codes
On May 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Print number 1003a
- Amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection
On January 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to consumer affairs and protection
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor