+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On July 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Signed chap.136
On July 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to governor
On June 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Passed senate
- 3rd reading cal.1684
- Substituted for s7815
On June 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to rules
On June 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.508
- Rules report cal.508
On June 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported
- Reported referred to rules
On June 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On June 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to governmental employees
+ − Vote
+ − Sponsor
Rules (request Of Abbate)
Type:
Primary Sponsor