+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed.
- Passed Senate (42-0).
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action.
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules.
- Referred to Senate Rules and Senate Judiciary.
+ − Votes (2)
February 20, 2014: Final Senate Vote
February 16, 2014: SRC Committee Report
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor