+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed.
- Passed Senate (33-0).
On March 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Public Affairs.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Conservation.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules.
- Referred to Senate Rules and Senate Conservation.
+ − Votes (3)
March 13, 2013: Final Senate Vote
March 11, 2013: SCONC Committee Report
March 5, 2013: SRC Committee Report
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor