+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Do pass; committee report adopted action postponed indefinitely.
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House Health, Government & Indian Affairs Committee.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (32-5).
- Floor amendment adopted.
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Public Affairs.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On January 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules.
- Referred to Senate Rules and Senate Public Affairs.
On December 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed in Senate.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 14, 2013: HHGIC Committee Report
March 13, 2013: Final Senate Vote
February 18, 2013: SPAC Committee Report
January 31, 2013: SRC Committee Report
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor