+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed.
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Passed House (63-0).
- Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Tabled temporarily by motion and then House.
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (26-0).
- Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action.
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Tabled temporarily by motion and then Senate.
+ − Votes (2)
March 5, 2013: Final House Vote
February 25, 2013: Final Senate Vote
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor