+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed.
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Passed House (70-0).
- Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action.
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Tabled temporarily by motion and then House.
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (38-0).
- Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action.
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Tabled temporarily by motion and then Senate.
+ − Votes (2)
March 10, 2015: Final House Vote
February 26, 2015: Final Senate Vote
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor