+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed in the Senate - Y:38 N:0
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- SCONC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to: SCONC
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Not Printed, Not referred to committee, tabled
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF
+ − Vote
February 13, 2016: Final Senate Vote
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor