+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed.
- Passed Senate (31-0).
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Public Affairs.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules.
- Referred to Senate Rules and Senate Public Affairs.
+ − Votes (3)
March 19, 2015: Final Senate Vote
March 13, 2015: SPAC Committee Report
March 11, 2015: SRC Committee Report
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor