+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Passed House (48-5).
- Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action.
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Tabled temporarily by motion and then House.
On February 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed.
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (33-0).
- Adopted.
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute and then do pass; committee report adopted.
- Do not pass; committee report adopted.
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules.
- Referred to Senate Rules and Senate Judiciary.
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed in Senate.
+ − Votes (4)
February 19, 2014: Final House Vote
February 13, 2014: Final Senate Vote
February 6, 2014: SJC Committee Report
January 29, 2014: SRC Committee Report
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor