+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Do pass; committee report adopted action postponed indefinitely.
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Health.
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (25-16).
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Public Affairs.
- Do pass as amended; committee report adopted.
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules.
- Referred to Senate Rules and Senate Public Affairs.
On December 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed in Senate.
+ − Votes (4)
March 17, 2015: HHC Committee Report
March 3, 2015: Final Senate Vote
February 27, 2015: SPAC Committee Report
February 13, 2015: SRC Committee Report
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor