+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Do pass; committee report adopted action postponed indefinitely.
- Referred to House Education.
On March 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (34-0).
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Public Affairs.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules.
- Referred to Senate Rules and Senate Public Affairs.
+ − Votes (4)
March 13, 2013: HEC Committee Report
March 11, 2013: Final Senate Vote
March 4, 2013: SPAC Committee Report
February 22, 2013: SRC Committee Report
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor