+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On January 12, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor - Chapter 67 - Mar. 7
- Legislative Day: 9Calendar Day: 02/13/2018Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:67 N:0
- Legislative Day: 8Calendar Day: 02/13/2018HTRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 8Calendar Day: 02/12/2018Sent to HTRC - Referrals: HTRC
On January 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Legislative Day: 18Calendar Day: 02/12/2018Passed in the Senate - Y:38 N:0
- Legislative Day: 15Calendar Day: 02/10/2018SFC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution
- Legislative Day: 5Calendar Day: 01/22/2018SCC: Reported by committee to fall within the purview of a 30 day session
- Legislative Day: 2Calendar Day: 01/18/2018Sent to SCC - Referrals: SCC/SFC
- Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF
+ − Votes (2)
February 13, 2018: Final House Vote
February 12, 2018: Final Senate Vote
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor