+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On December 17, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor - Chapter 151 - Apr. 2
- Legislative Day: 13Calendar Day: 03/13/2019Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:37 N:30
- Legislative Day: 12Calendar Day: 03/09/2019HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 12Calendar Day: 03/08/2019HCPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 10Calendar Day: 03/01/2019Sent to HCPAC - Referrals: HCPAC/HJC
On December 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Legislative Day: 15Calendar Day: 02/27/2019Passed in the Senate - Y:22 N:17
- Legislative Day: 14Calendar Day: 02/26/2019SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 9Calendar Day: 02/12/2019SCONC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
- Legislative Day: 1Calendar Day: 01/16/2019Sent to SCONC - Referrals: SCONC/SJC
- Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF