+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (36-0).
- Floor amendment adopted.
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House Consumer & Public Affairs.
- Referred to House Consumer & Public Affairs and House Appropriations & Finance.
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Do pass as amended; committee report adopted.
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Public Affairs.
- Referred to Senate Public Affairs and Senate Judiciary.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 9, 2013: Final Senate Vote
March 5, 2013: SJC Committee Report
February 27, 2013: SPAC Committee Report
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor