+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Education.
- Committee report adopted without recommendation.
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Public Affairs.
- Germane.
- Referred to Senate Committees' Committee.
- Referred to Senate Committees' Committee, Senate Public Affairs and Senate Education.
On December 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed in Senate.
+ − Votes (2)
February 5, 2014: SPAC Committee Report
January 27, 2014: SCC Committee Report
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor