+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor - Chapter 169 - Apr. 2
- Legislative Day: 13Calendar Day: 03/13/2019Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:61 N:3
- Legislative Day: 12Calendar Day: 03/11/2019HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 12Calendar Day: 03/08/2019HLLC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 10Calendar Day: 03/01/2019Sent to HLLC - Referrals: HLLC/HAFC
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Legislative Day: 15Calendar Day: 02/28/2019Passed in the Senate - Y:39 N:0
- Legislative Day: 15Calendar Day: 02/28/2019Senate Floor Amendment
- Legislative Day: 15Calendar Day: 02/27/2019SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
- Legislative Day: 12Calendar Day: 02/21/2019SCONC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution
- Legislative Day: 5Calendar Day: 02/01/2019Sent to SCONC - Referrals: SCONC/SFC