+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed BY GOV (Apr 7) Ch 67.
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Passed House (58-0).
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Ways & Means.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary.
- Referred to House Judiciary and House Ways & Means.
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-0).
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Finance.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Public Affairs.
- Referred to Senate Public Affairs and Senate Finance.
On December 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed in Senate.
+ − Votes (6)
March 20, 2015: Final House Vote
March 19, 2015: HWMC Committee Report
March 13, 2015: HJC Committee Report
February 26, 2015: Final Senate Vote
February 20, 2015: SFC Committee Report
February 2, 2015: SPAC Committee Report
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor