+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Government, Elections & Indian Affairs.
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (28-10).
- Floor amendment adopted.
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Do pass as amended; committee report adopted.
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Public Affairs.
- Referred to Senate Public Affairs and Senate Judiciary.