+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Passed House (62-1).
- Floor amendment adopted.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed (Apr 2) Ch118.
- Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill.
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action.
- Referred to House Appropriations & Finance.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House Consumer & Public Affairs.
- Referred to House Consumer & Public Affairs and House Appropriations & Finance.
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-0).
- Floor amendment adopted.
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Finance.
- Do pass as amended; committee report adopted.
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Public Affairs.
- Referred to Senate Public Affairs and Senate Finance.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
March 14, 2013: Final House Vote
March 8, 2013: HCPAC Committee Report
February 28, 2013: Final Senate Vote
February 27, 2013: SFC Committee Report
February 20, 2013: SPAC Committee Report
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor