+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary.
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (38-1).
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Public Affairs.
- Referred to Senate Public Affairs and Senate Judiciary.
+ − Votes (3)
March 3, 2015: Final Senate Vote
February 26, 2015: SJC Committee Report
February 13, 2015: SPAC Committee Report
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor