+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Action Postponed Indefinitely
- Legislative Day: 14Calendar Day: 03/14/2019HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 13Calendar Day: 03/13/2019Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Legislative Day: 21Calendar Day: 03/11/2019Passed in the Senate - Y:39 N:0
- Legislative Day: 21Calendar Day: 03/10/2019SFC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution
- Legislative Day: 14Calendar Day: 02/25/2019SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 3Calendar Day: 01/24/2019Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SFC
+ − Vote
March 11, 2019: Final Senate Vote
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor