+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Tabled temporarily by motion and then Houseaction postponed indefinitely.
- Motion to reconsider adopted.
- Failed passage in House (32-34).
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Do pass as amended; committee report adopted.
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-0).
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House Voters & Elections.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action.
- Tabled temporarily by motion.
- Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action.
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules.
- Referred to Senate Rules and Senate Judiciary.
+ − Votes (4)
March 10, 2013: Final House Vote
March 5, 2013: HVEC Committee Report
February 22, 2013: Final Senate Vote
February 20, 2013: SRC Committee Report
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor