+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor - Chapter 22 - Mar. 1
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:65 N:0
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Sent to HAFC - Referrals: HAFC
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed in the Senate - Y:36 N:0
- SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- SCC: Reported by committee to fall within the purview of a 30 day session
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to: SCC/SFC
- SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but without recommendation on Committee Substitution
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Not Printed
+ − Votes (2)
February 18, 2016: Final House Vote
February 16, 2016: Final Senate Vote
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor