+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On December 17, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor - Chapter 262 - Apr. 4
- Legislative Day: 21Calendar Day: 03/10/2019Senate has concurred with House Amendments
- Legislative Day: 12Calendar Day: 03/09/2019Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:48 N:17
- Legislative Day: 11Calendar Day: 03/03/2019HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
- Legislative Day: 7Calendar Day: 02/14/2019Sent to HJC - Referrals: HJC
On December 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Legislative Day: 9Calendar Day: 02/13/2019Passed in the Senate - Y:36 N:6
- Legislative Day: 9Calendar Day: 02/11/2019SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
- Legislative Day: 4Calendar Day: 01/28/2019SRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 1Calendar Day: 01/16/2019Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SJC
- Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF
+ − Votes (2)
March 9, 2019: Final House Vote
February 13, 2019: Final Senate Vote
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor