+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Finance.
- Committee substitute and then do pass; committee report adopted.
- Do not pass; committee report adopted.
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation.
- Germane.
- Referred to Senate Committees' Committee.
- Referred to Senate Committees' Committee, Senate Corporations & Transportation and Senate Finance.
On December 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed in Senate.
+ − Votes (2)
February 7, 2014: SCORC Committee Report
January 27, 2014: SCC Committee Report
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor