+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 20, 2021 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor
- Senate has concurred with House Amendments
- Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:66 N:0
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
On March 13, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to HJC - Referrals: HJC
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed in the Senate - Y:34 N:4
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- SHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to SHPAC - Referrals: SHPAC/SJC
+ − Votes (2)
March 20, 2021: Final House Vote
March 12, 2021: Final Senate Vote
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor