+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Finance.
- .
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary.
- Do pass as amended; committee report adopted.
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Public Affairs.
- Referred to Senate Public Affairs, Senate Judiciary and Senate Finance.
+ − Votes (2)
March 7, 2015: SJC Committee Report
February 25, 2015: SPAC Committee Report
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor