+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Action Postponed Indefinitely
- Legislative Day: 17Calendar Day: 02/19/2020Passed in the Senate - Y:36 N:2
- Legislative Day: 17Calendar Day: 02/19/2020Senate Floor Amendment
- Legislative Day: 16Calendar Day: 02/19/2020SJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution
- Legislative Day: 12Calendar Day: 02/15/2020Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
- Legislative Day: 9Calendar Day: 02/11/2020SCC: Reported by committee to fall within the purview of a 30 day session
- Legislative Day: 6Calendar Day: 02/05/2020Sent to SCC - Referrals: SCC/SRC/SJC