+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor - Chapter 21 - Mar. 1
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:57 N:0
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
- Sent to HEC - Referrals: HEC/HAFC
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed in the Senate - Y:37 N:0
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- SEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- SCC: Reported by committee to fall within the purview of a 30 day session
- Sent to SCC - Referrals: SCC/SEC/SPAC
+ − Votes (2)
February 18, 2016: Final House Vote
February 16, 2016: Final Senate Vote
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor