+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed Ch143.
On March 16, 2013 in the House:
- Passed House (64-0).
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action.
- Referred to House Judiciary.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House Business & Industry.
- Referred to House Business & Industry and House Judiciary.
On March 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-0).
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary.
- Committee substitute and then do pass; committee report adopted.
- Do not pass; committee report adopted.
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation.
- Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation and Senate Judiciary.
+ − Votes (5)
March 16, 2013: Final House Vote
March 15, 2013: HBIC Committee Report
March 12, 2013: Final Senate Vote
March 5, 2013: SJC Committee Report
February 15, 2013: SCORC Committee Report
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor