+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed BY GOV (Apr 3) Ch 37.
On March 21, 2015 in the House:
- House and then.
On March 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate and then cncr.
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Passed House (36-23).
- Floor amendment adopted.
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On March 8, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- HAWC.
- Referred to House Judiciary.
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (36-5).
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Conservation.
- Referred to Senate Conservation and Senate Judiciary.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 18, 2015: Final House Vote
March 17, 2015: HJC Committee Report
March 9, 2015: HAWC Committee Report
February 23, 2015: Final Senate Vote
February 19, 2015: SJC Committee Report
February 6, 2015: SCONC Committee Report
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor