+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On January 21, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor - Chapter 98 - Mar. 28
- Legislative Day: 15Calendar Day: 03/16/2019Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:61 N:0
- Legislative Day: 14Calendar Day: 03/14/2019HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 12Calendar Day: 03/09/2019HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 9Calendar Day: 02/27/2019Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC/HJC
On January 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Legislative Day: 15Calendar Day: 02/27/2019Passed in the Senate - Y:32 N:0
- Legislative Day: 14Calendar Day: 02/25/2019SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
- Legislative Day: 9Calendar Day: 02/11/2019SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
- Legislative Day: 1Calendar Day: 01/21/2019Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SJC
+ − Votes (2)
March 16, 2019: Final House Vote
February 27, 2019: Final Senate Vote
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor