+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed BY GOV (Apr 3) Ch 36.
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Passed House (47-15).
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (37-0).
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Ways & Means.
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Finance.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Public Affairs.
- Referred to Senate Public Affairs and Senate Finance.
+ − Votes (5)
March 19, 2015: Final House Vote
March 19, 2015: HWMC Committee Report
February 27, 2015: Final Senate Vote
February 25, 2015: SFC Committee Report
February 18, 2015: SPAC Committee Report
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor