+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On January 11, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor - Chapter 53 - Mar. 14
- Legislative Day: 12Calendar Day: 03/08/2019Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:62 N:0
- Legislative Day: 10Calendar Day: 03/01/2019HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 8Calendar Day: 02/22/2019HCPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 5Calendar Day: 02/08/2019Sent to HCPAC - Referrals: HCPAC/HHHC
On January 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Legislative Day: 8Calendar Day: 02/07/2019Passed in the Senate - Y:36 N:0
- Legislative Day: 5Calendar Day: 02/01/2019SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 4Calendar Day: 01/25/2019SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution
- Legislative Day: 1Calendar Day: 01/17/2019Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SFC
- Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF
+ − Votes (2)
March 8, 2019: Final House Vote
February 7, 2019: Final Senate Vote
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor