+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 20, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor - Chapter 73 - Apr. 6
- Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:68 N:0
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
On March 14, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to HAFC - Referrals: HAFC
On March 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed in the Senate - Y:41 N:0
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- SEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to SEC - Referrals: SEC/SFC
+ − Votes (2)
March 20, 2021: Final House Vote
March 13, 2021: Final Senate Vote
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor